California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013