Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |