|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 716, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2042.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2601.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 718.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 404.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|