|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1947.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2599.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|