Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 751.) (May 1). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |