Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 568.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|