Assembly | 08/13/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1089.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 755.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |