|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2037.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2711.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1172.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1009.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 485.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|