Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1113.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1009.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 663.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|