Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 2). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|