Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |