|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 916, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 6452.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6340.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 2635.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2600.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|