|
05/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5024.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2685.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2598.) (January 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|