Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |