Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2014 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2014 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2599.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2014 | Set for hearing January 15. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |