07/03/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2013. | |||
07/03/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2131.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 947.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7). | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |