California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013