Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |