|
08/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2292.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 607.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 567.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|