Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 488.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |