Assembly | 08/08/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2013 | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1099.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1010.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 465.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |