California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Amended

Bill August 28, 2013
Bill August 14, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill May 15, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013