Assembly
|
01/13/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 733.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|