Senate | 02/06/2014 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Corbett. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 733.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |