California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013