|
09/17/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 392, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4756.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4670.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Set for hearing August 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4543.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6046.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|