LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB333
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB333
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB333
Compare Versions
SB333 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB333 Enrolled August 23, 2013
SB333 Amended August 12, 2013
SB333 Amended April 16, 2013
SB333 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB333 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB333 Enrolled August 23, 2013
SB333 Amended August 12, 2013
SB333 Amended April 16, 2013
SB333 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare