California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB338 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 14, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill July 3, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill June 12, 2013
Bill May 13, 2013