|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 285, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 2704.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 816.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|