California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2013

Amended

Bill May 30, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013