LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB342
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB342
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB342
Compare Versions
SB342 Chaptered October 2, 2013
SB342 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB342 Amended September 3, 2013
SB342 Amended May 24, 2013
SB342 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB342 Chaptered October 2, 2013
SB342 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB342 Amended September 3, 2013
SB342 Amended May 24, 2013
SB342 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare