California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2013

Amended

Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013