California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013