California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB353 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 14, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013