Assembly | 06/19/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2013 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1102.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1012.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 488.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |