Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2013 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 941.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 639.) (April 23). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |