California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Amended

Bill August 26, 2013
Bill August 20, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill May 16, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013