Assembly | 06/26/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 605.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 484.) (April 10). | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |