Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2014 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |