California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB367 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2013

Amended

Bill August 15, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013