|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 717, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2043.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2706.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1045.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 786.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|