Senate | 05/01/2013 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 749.) | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 5. Page 564.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |