06/17/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2013. | |||
06/17/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 1834.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 709.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 534.) (April 15). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |