California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013