California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB38 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013