Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 563.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |