Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on JUD.) suspended. (Page 5606.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2689.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Corbett.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 852.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|