Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |