California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Amended

Bill January 17, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013