Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1166.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1013.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 660.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 487.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|